IL HB3749 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 relating to the offense of disorderly conduct at a funeral or memorial service. Increases the time that a specified place can be considered a "funeral site" from 30 minutes before and after a funeral to one hour before and after. Increases the distance from which the conduct at the funeral or memorial service is prohibited from 300 feet to 1,000 feet of any ingress or egress of the funeral site. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-DISORDERLY CONDUCT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee; |
2018-04-12 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-03-21 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-15 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 26-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3749&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3749.htm |