IL HB3741 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Bedbug Inspection Act. Requires persons engaged in the business of renting furniture and electronic equipment to inspect the furniture and electronic equipment for bedbugs and other pests before renting to a subsequent customer. Requires that infested furniture or equipment be treated before renting to a subsequent customer. Authorizes an action for damages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BEDBUG INSPECTION ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 098-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-29HouseArrived in House
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
2017-05-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-005-000
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback