IL HB3741 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Baccalaureate Degree Pilot Program Act. Establishes the Baccalaureate Degree Pilot Program, to be implemented and administered by the Board of Higher Education, in conjunction with the State Board of Education and the Illinois Community College Board, with the goal of creating a model of articulation and coordination among grade K-12 schools, community colleges, and public universities that will allow students to earn a baccalaureate degree for a total cost not exceeding $10,000, including textbooks. Provides that the Board of Higher Education, in conjunction with the State Board of Education and the Illinois Community College Board, shall determine which public universities, public community colleges, and school districts are to participate in the pilot program (in 3 areas of this State). Requires the universities, community colleges, and school districts participating in the pilot program to coordinate their efforts to expedite the progress of participating students from high school to community college to university to earn their baccalaureate degrees for a total cost not exceeding $10,000, including textbooks. Sets forth the components of the pilot program.
Title
BACCALAUREATE DEGREE PILOT PRO
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3741&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3741.htm |