IL HB3740 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. In the definitions of "institution of higher learning", "qualified institution", and "institution", provides that the exclusion of academic programs for incarcerated students does not apply to the monetary award program. Provides for a July 1, 2024 effective date.
Title
HIGHER ED-INCARCERATED STUDENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2025-01-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-11-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-11-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-11-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-034-000 |
2023-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 947 | 65.100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |