IL HB3737 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Government Cybersecurity Review Act. Creates the Division of Cybersecurity Inspection within the Department of Innovation and Technology. Provides that the Division shall review all websites operated by State agencies to determine whether cybersecurity flaws and data breach risks exist. Provides that, if the Division finds that a cybersecurity flaw or data breach risk exists, the Division may issue an order to the State agency to cease operation of the website until the cybersecurity flaw or data breach risk has been resolved.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVT CYBERSECURITY REVIEW ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-05-29HouseArrived in House
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000
2017-05-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
2017-05-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2017-05-12SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2017-05-11SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-20SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-04-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-04-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2017-04-05HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 010-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback