IL HB3729 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Third Reading - Lost; 011-028-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Third Reading - Lost; 011-028-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In a Section pertaining to the expenditure of the amounts collected by a municipality from a tax on hotel rooms, provides that a municipality may expend the money collected from the tax for any municipal purpose. Deletes the requirement that a municipality must expend the amounts collected from the tax solely to promote tourism and conventions and to attract nonresident overnight visitors. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-HOTEL TAX-EXPENDITURES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Third Reading - Lost; 011-028-000 | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy | |
2009-05-21 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-001-000 | |
2009-05-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2009-05-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass Local Government; 005-004-000 | |
2009-04-28 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-041-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 005-000-003 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | First Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-02-25 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |