IL HB3720 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act, the Illinois Income Tax Act, the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Telecommunications Excise Tax Act, and the Telecommunications Infrastructure Maintenance Fee Act. Provides for transfers from certain special funds of the State to the Tax Compliance and Administration Fund. Provides that those moneys shall be used, subject to appropriation, to fund additional auditors and compliance personnel at the Department of Revenue. Effective on the first day of the first calendar month to occur not less than 30 days after this Act becomes law.
Title
REVENUE-AUDITORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | First Reading |
2013-10-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 630 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 635 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3720&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3720.htm |