IL HB3706 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the University Park Development Authority Act. Creates the University Park Development Authority for the purpose of facilitating and promoting the redevelopment of certain property. Provides that the jurisdiction of the Authority extends over the Village of University Park and any and all property that the Village may annex during the course of the existence of the Authority. Provides that the Authority is governed by a 5-member Board of Directors. Sets forth the powers and responsibilities of the Authority, including the power to acquire, own, lease, sell, and dispose of real property and, under the supervision of the Illinois Finance Authority, the power to issue revenue bonds. Contains other provisions. Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. Provides that all bond issuances of the University Park Development Authority are subject to supervision, management, control, and approval of the Illinois Finance Authority. Effective immediately.
Title
UNIVERSITY PARK DEVELOPMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 016-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |