IL HB3705 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Address Confidentiality for Victims of Domestic Violence Act. Provides that a person who is a victim of, among other things, sexual assault or stalking may apply for the address confidentiality program under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ATTY GEN-CONFIDENTIAL ADDRESS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7506115Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback