IL HB3674 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Safety Drill Act. Makes changes to provisions of the Act concerning law enforcement drills. Provides that no later than 90 days after the first day of each school year, schools must conduct at least one walk-through law enforcement drill (rather than one law enforcement drill) that addresses an active threat or active shooter within a school building. Makes changes concerning how law enforcement drills are conducted and the exemption of students. Requires drill content to be created by a team that includes administrators, teachers, school-based health and mental health professionals, and law enforcement agency members. Sets forth requirements and recommendations for the drill content. Within 2 weeks following the execution of a walk-through drill, requires the team to meet to evaluate the implementation of the drill and to determine and review if any students or educators exhibited signs of trauma during or after the drill so that the team may evaluate if changes in the drill content or procedures are required. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
SCHOOL SAFETY DRILLS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 128 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3674&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3674.htm |