IL HB3670 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Increases from $200 to $500 the minimum base penalty for transacting business in this State without authority. Provides that a corporation that effects a change in the number of issued shares or the amount of paid-in capital prior to January 1, 2018, rather than effecting a change at any time, shall file a report regarding the issued shares or paid-in capital. Provides that franchise taxes are not payable on or after January 1, 2018. Provides that on and after January 1, 2018, a corporation that fails to file an annual report shall pay a penalty of $50 plus $10 per month or part of a month that the report is delinquent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CORPORATIONS-FRANCHISE TAXES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
805513.70Amended CodeCitation Text
805514.30Amended CodeCitation Text
805515.35Amended CodeCitation Text
805515.65Amended CodeCitation Text
805515.97Amended CodeCitation Text
805516.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback