IL HB3661 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall revoke for one year the Firearm Owner's Identification Card of a card holder who reports to the local law enforcement agency his or her firearms lost or stolen in 3 separate incidents within a 2-year period. Provides that any law enforcement agency that has knowledge that a card holder has reported his or her firearms lost or stolen in 3 separate incidents within a 2-year period shall forthwith forward that information to the Department of State Police. Provides that an "incident" means an occasion in which the card holder's firearm or firearms have been lost or stolen regardless of the number of firearms stolen in the incident and the report of the loss or theft of the firearm or firearms on one occasion shall be considered one incident. Provides that if a law enforcement agency recovers a firearm that had been lost or stolen and has not been previously reported as lost or stolen, the recovery of the firearm shall be considered an incident for the purpose of this provision. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the sentence for attempt to acquire a firearm by use of a revoked Firearm Owner's Identification Card is a Class 4 felony.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID-REVOKE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 8-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3661&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3661.htm |