IL HB3661 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0035
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0035
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Removes obsolete provisions requiring the Department of the Lottery to submit a request to the United States Department of Justice to review the State's plan for an Internet program. Provides that Lotto, Lucky Day Lotto, Mega Millions, Powerball, Pick 3, Pick 4, and other draw games that are offered at retail locations may be offered by the Department of the Lottery through its Internet program. Requires the private manager to obtain the Director of the Lottery's approval before providing any draw games. Provides that any game tickets that are approved for sale by lottery licensees are automatically approved for sale through the Internet program. Requires the Department of the Lottery to maintain responsible gaming controls in its policies. Provides that nothing in the provisions shall be construed as prohibiting lottery tickets authorized for sale through the Internet program from also continuing to be sold at retail locations. Extends the repeal date of the Department of the Lottery's Internet program from July 1, 2019 to July 1, 2028. Effective immediately.
Title
LOTTERY-INTERNET PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0035 |
2019-06-28 | House | Effective Date June 28, 2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-004-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-003-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-013-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 7.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |