IL HB3646 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that a pet shop operator may offer for sale a dog or cat only if the dog or cat is obtained from an animal control facility or animal shelter. Provides that an animal control facility or animal shelter that supplies dogs or cats to pet shop operators to be offered for sale shall not be a dog breeder or a cat breeder or obtain dogs or cats from a dog breeder, a cat breeder, a person who resells dogs or cats from a breeder, or a person who sells dogs or cats at auction in exchange for payment or compensation. Defines the term "offer for sale" and modifies the definitions of "pet shop operator" and "animal shelter". Effective 180 days after becoming law.
Title
ANIMAL WELFARE-PET SHOPS
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] |
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 20.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3646&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3646.htm |