IL HB3645 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides for the licensure of naturopathic physicians. Makes conforming changes in various other Acts. Effective immediately.
Title
NATUROPATHIC PHYSICIANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | First Reading |
2013-07-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 26-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3945 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 122-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 61 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 63 | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 63 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 90 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
710 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 50 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 50 | 5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |