IL HB3629 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that when the victim is under 18 years of age at the time of the offense, a prosecution for involuntary servitude, involuntary sexual servitude of a minor, or trafficking in persons and related offenses may be commenced within 25 years (rather than one year) of the victim attaining the age of 18 years. Provides that involuntary sexual servitude of a minor is a Class X felony for which the person shall be sentenced to a minimum term of imprisonment of 25 years if the person under 18 years of age who is the victim of the offense has engaged in commercial sexual activity, a sexually-explicit performance, or the production of pornography. Provides that involuntary sexual servitude of a minor is a Class X felony for which the person shall be sentenced to a minimum term of imprisonment of 10 years if the person under 18 years of age has not engaged in the prohibited activities. Provides for the same penalty for trafficking in persons and involuntary servitude if the victim of the offense was under 18 years of age. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Includes in the definition of "childhood sexual abuse" human trafficking violation in which a person under 18 years of age was a victim. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, an action for damages for personal injury based on childhood sexual abuse may be commenced at any time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN TRAFFICKING-VICTIM<18

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-04HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720510-9Amended CodeCitation Text
72053-6Amended CodeCitation Text
735513-202.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback