IL HB3619 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Allows the board of trustees of a community college district to establish and offer a baccalaureate-level early childhood education program and confer a bachelor of applied science degree in early childhood education and a Professional Educator License with endorsements in early childhood education and early childhood special education under certain conditions. Provides for an application for approval from the Illinois Community College Board. Sets forth college requirements and prohibitions. Provides that a candidate for educator licensure must successfully complete applicable testing requirements prior to the issuance of an educator license and any endorsements. Provides for a statewide evaluation of such programs.
Title
COM COL-BACHELOR'S DEGREE
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Lance Yednock [D] | Rep. Delia Ramirez [D] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] |
Rep. Edgar Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3619&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3619.htm |