IL HB3616 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a period of probation, a term of periodic imprisonment, or conditional discharge may not be imposed if the defendant is convicted of a Class 3 felony or higher violation of an offense involving the corruption of a public official when the offense consists of theft, fraud, extortion or a violation of the Official Misconduct, Deception Relating To Certification Of Disadvantaged Business Enterprises, or Public Contracts Article of the Criminal Code of 1961 and either: (1) the defendant was an elected official at the time of the offense, or (2) the offense involved more than $10,000 in money or property, based on either the value of any payments or the value of the item that was the object of such offense. Provides that this provision does not apply if the prosecutor certifies to the court at the time of sentencing that the defendant has provided substantial assistance in the case or another prosecution of substantial public importance.
Title
CD CORR-CORRUPTION
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. Renee Kosel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3616&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB3616.htm |