IL HB3614 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use of Intoxicating Compounds Act. Provides that no person shall possess any substance not listed in the Act for the purpose of inducing in the user an intoxicated condition, other than: (1) distilled spirits, wine, malt beverages, or tobacco; (2) any product or substance regulated by the federal Food and Drug Administration; or (3) any controlled substance listed in the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that no person shall knowingly sell or offer for sale, deliver, or give to any person any substance not listed in the Act which will induce an intoxicated condition, when the seller, offeror, or deliverer knows or has reason to know that the compound is intended for use to induce that condition. Establishes penalties based on the amount of the prohibited substance.
Title
INTOXICATING COMPOUNDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 690 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 690 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 690 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3614&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3614.htm |