IL HB3610 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0517
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0517
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that brew pubs wholly owned and operated by the same licensee may combine each location's production limit of 155,000 gallons of beer per year and allocate the aggregate total between the wholly owned, operated, and licensed locations. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-BREW PUBS
Sponsors
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Sen. Diane Pappas [D] |
Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0517 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-000-001 |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-000-001 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |