IL HB3603 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cemetery Care Act. Amends the definition of "care funds" to delete language including income accumulated from funds held in trust for the care of the cemetery. Defines "income" as any return received in money or property derived from the use and investment of the principal or corpus of the trust, including distributions in the form of a stock dividend and the amount of a net gain or loss realized from proceeds of the sale, redemption, transfer, or other disposition of the trust principal or corpus.
Title
CEMETERY CARE ACT-DEFINITIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
760 | 100 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |