IL HB3591 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0442
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0442
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Adds a provision applicable to new hires that provides that an individual shall not be paid any of the benefits provided under the Code if he or she is convicted of a felony relating to, arising out of, or in connection with his or her service as a member or participant. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-NEW HIRE-CONVICTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0442 |
2011-08-19 | House | Effective Date August 19, 2011 |
2011-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2011 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 006-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions and Investments |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2011 |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-06 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-005-002 |
2011-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-03-03 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |