IL HB3590 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Military Veterans Assistance Act. Provides that the county board of a county having a population of more than 3,000,000 may, but is not required to, enter into an intergovernmental agreement with and provide funding to the Veterans Assistance Commission of the county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS ASSISTANCE-EXEMPTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2021-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 006-000-000
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3304510Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback