IL HB3587 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Changes the date in which the provisions creating the Sentencing Policy Advisory Council are repealed from December 31, 2015 to December 31, 2020. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-SPAC-REPEAL EXTENSION
Sponsors
Rep. Christian Mitchell [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. John Anthony [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0101 |
2015-07-22 | House | Effective Date July 22, 2015 |
2015-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-000-000 |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-04-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-8-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |