IL HB3583 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that a person may place or scatter deer bait otherwise prohibited when not in active deer hunting season. Provides that person who unlawfully baits deer is guilty of a petty offense subject to a mandatory fine of not less than $500 and shall lose hunting privileges in this State for a period of not less than a year.
Title
WILDLIFE-DEER BAIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | To Animal Baiting Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |