IL HB3582 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Victims' Economic Security and Safety Act. Provides that victims and family members of victims of crimes of violence (in addition to victims of domestic violence, sexual violence, and gender violence) are subject to the provisions of the Act regarding unpaid leave and prohibited discriminatory acts. Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that victims of crimes of violence shall not be barred from collecting voluntary leave benefits. Defines terms. Makes other changes.
Title
EMPLOYMENT-CRIME VICTIM LEAVE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0487 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 105-009-001 |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-013-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 27, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 005-001-000 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-006-003 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-010-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 180 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 180 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 180 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 180 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 180 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 180 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |