IL HB3539 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2015, the Department shall pay into the Use and Occupation Tax Refund Fund 0.1% of the net revenue realized for the preceding month from the taxes imposed under those Acts. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be expended exclusively for the purpose of paying refunds resulting from overpayment of tax liability under those Acts. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Use and Occupation Tax Refund Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-REFUNDS
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Rep. David Harris [R] |
Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2015-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.866 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |