IL HB3538 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Keep Illinois Business Act. Provides that any recipient business that chooses to move all or part of its business operations and the jobs created by its business out-of-State shall be deemed to no longer qualify for State economic development assistance, and shall be required to pay to the relevant State granting agency the full amount of any economic development assistance it received. Provides for procedures for the recovery of economic development assistance, including required notice to the recipient business and an opportunity for a hearing. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

KEEP ILLINOIS BUSINESS ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-10HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1148
2018-12-10HouseEffective Date December 10, 2018
2018-12-10HouseGovernor Approved
2018-11-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-11-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-11-29HouseHouse Concurs
2018-11-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 109-000-000
2018-11-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2018-11-29House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-11-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-11-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-11-20HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-11-20HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-11-14HouseArrived in House
2018-11-14SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-11-14Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-11-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler
2018-11-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
2018-11-14SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-11-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-11-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-11-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-11-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2018-11-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-11-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 14, 2018
2018-11-13SenateSecond Reading
2018-11-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-11-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-11-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-11-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-11-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-13SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-048-000
2017-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-04-06HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-003-000
2017-03-16HouseRemains in Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-09HouseTo Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3538&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3538.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3538eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3538enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1148.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3538sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3538sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3538_04242017_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB3538_11142018_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3538sam002_11292018_011001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB3538sam001_11292018_011000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback