IL HB3538 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Raffles and Poker Runs Act. Redefines "poker run". Allows bona fide not-for-profit organizations to be licensed to hold poker runs. Provides that the governing body of any county shall (rather than may) establish a system for the licensing of organizations to operate poker runs. Makes changes concerning which organizations shall be issued poker run licenses under the Act and the purposes for these licenses. Removes the requirement that poker runs by an organization be under the supervision of a single manager designated by the organization and associated bond requirements. Makes changes in provisions concerning records. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
GAMING-POKER RUNS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 80 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0405 |
2015-08-19 | House | Effective Date August 19, 2015 |
2015-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-07-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-06-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-06-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-06-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-06-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-06-23 | House | House Concurs |
2015-06-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 080-022-000 |
2015-06-23 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-06-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2015-06-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-06-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-06-22 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2015-06-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-002-000 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2015 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McCann |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-001 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-05-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Gaming |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-014-000 |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-03-26 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-03-13 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 15 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 15 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 15 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 15 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |