IL HB3520 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Revenue Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that the Department of Revenue and the Department of Employment Security shall cooperate by sharing information and data necessary to identify fraudulent activity with respect to claims for unemployment benefits and to protect taxpayers from the effects of reported income in connection with fraudulent claims.
Title
IDOR IDES COOPERATION-FRAUD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-05-12 | Senate | To Unemployment Insurance |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2505 | 2505-760 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 405 | 2703 | New Code | See Bill Text |