IL HB3510 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act. Provides that, no later than one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act, landowners owning more than 5% of land in a municipality within the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District shall be in conformance with the requirements of the District's Watershed Management Ordinance. Effective immediately.
Title
MWRD-WATERSHED MANAGEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule April 28, 2023 |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3510&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3510.htm |