IL HB3510 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, Service Use Tax Act, Service Occupation Tax Act, and Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Imposes a 7% surcharge on firearms and firearm component parts. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Student Mental Health Services Fund. Provides that the proceeds from the surcharge shall be deposited into the Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the State Board of Education to provide mental health services at any public, non-public, or parochial school in the State. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TAX-FIREARMS
Sponsors
Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] |
Rep. Yehiel Kalish [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3510&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3510.htm |