IL HB3503 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cable and Video Customer Protection Article of the Public Utilities Act. Provides that upon the customer's election, a cable or video provider that rents internet modems to a customer shall cease imposing rental charges after the customer has paid to the provider an amount equal to the cost of the modem provided.
Title
CABLE EQUIP RENTAL OPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 39 N: 68 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 039-068-004 |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-04-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 22-501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |