IL HB3501 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities, provides that, for taxable years 2017 and thereafter, if the veteran has a service connected disability of 20% (currently, 30%) or more but less than 50%, then the annual exemption is $2,500. Provides that that exemption also applies to veterans who are not disabled but are over the age of 75. Removes a requirement that the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities applies only to residences with an equalized assessed value of less than $250,000. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-DISABLED VETS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-21HouseTabled
2017-03-21HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-03-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-169Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback