IL HB3471 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance to provide coverage for cardiopulmonary monitors for a person 18 years old or younger who has had a cardiopulmonary event. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-CARDIOPULMONARY MONITOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-07HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0218
2019-08-07HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-07HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass Insurance; 018-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Insurance
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-09HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-002-000
2019-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 022-000-000
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.33New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback