IL HB3458 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Natural Areas Stewardship Act. Creates the Illinois Land Conservation and Stewardship Grant Program to make grants to conservation land trusts to steward lands identified in the Illinois Natural Area Inventory, lands designated as a buffer area, lands designated as a nature preserve, or lands registered as an Illinois Land and Water Reserve. Establishes the duties of the Department of Natural Resources in carrying out the provisions of the Act. Creates provisions concerning violations of the Act and administrative review. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NATURAL AREA STEWARD GRANT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2017-03-16HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback