IL HB3457 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park and Recreational Facility Construction Act. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall give priority to such projects as handicap-accessible playground equipment.
Title
PARKS/REC-HANDICAP ACCESSIBLE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0391 |
2015-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 764 | 10-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |