IL HB3450 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act by extending the repeal date of the Home Medical Equipment and Service Provider License Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Home Medical Equipment and Services Provider License Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning powers and duties of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, the Home Medical Equipment and Services Board, applications for original licensure, discipline of license, investigations, notices and hearings, findings and recommendations by the Board, hearing officers, and the application of the Administrative Review law. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of any change of address or email address through specified means. Provides provisions concerning confidentiality of information collected by the Department in the course of an examination or investigation. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
HOME MEDICAL EQUIP-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0525 |
2017-09-22 | House | Effective Date September 22, 2017 |
2017-09-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-30 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-30 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 51 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 51 | 135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 51 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 51 | 95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |