IL HB3450 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act by extending the repeal date of the Home Medical Equipment and Service Provider License Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Home Medical Equipment and Services Provider License Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning powers and duties of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, the Home Medical Equipment and Services Board, applications for original licensure, discipline of license, investigations, notices and hearings, findings and recommendations by the Board, hearing officers, and the application of the Administrative Review law. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of any change of address or email address through specified means. Provides provisions concerning confidentiality of information collected by the Department in the course of an examination or investigation. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOME MEDICAL EQUIP-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0525
2017-09-22HouseEffective Date September 22, 2017
2017-09-22HouseGovernor Approved
2017-07-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-30HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-30House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-25HouseArrived in House
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
2017-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2255110Amended CodeCitation Text
22551100Amended CodeCitation Text
22551110Amended CodeCitation Text
22551115Amended CodeCitation Text
22551125Amended CodeCitation Text
2255113New CodeSee Bill Text
22551135Amended CodeCitation Text
2255115Amended CodeCitation Text
22551150Amended CodeCitation Text
22551165Amended CodeCitation Text
22551185New CodeSee Bill Text
2255120Amended CodeCitation Text
2255125Amended CodeCitation Text
2255130Amended CodeCitation Text
2255175Amended CodeCitation Text
2255195Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback