IL HB3433 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Requires an agency that proposes a new rule or an amendment to an existing rule that may have an impact on persons or entities in downstate Illinois to consider specified methods for reducing the impact of that rulemaking and provide an opportunity to participate in the rulemaking process before or during the notice period utilizing specified techniques. Requires each agency to include in its regulatory agenda summary a statement of whether a rule will affect persons or entities in downstate Illinois. Defines "downstate Illinois". Effective immediately.
Title
ADMIN PRO-DOWNSTATE ILLINOIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 1-33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3433&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3433.htm |