IL HB3427 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Estate and Generation-Skipping Transfer Tax Act. Provides that the exclusion amount is $2,000,000 for persons dying on or after January 1, 2022 (currently, $4,000,000). Effective immediately.
Title
ESTATE TAX-EXCLUSION AMOUNT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 405 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3427&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3427.htm |