IL HB3419 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the State Jobs Guarantee Act. Provides that the Department of Labor shall establish a program to provide competitive grants to eligible political subdivisions that have an unemployment rate that is not less than 150% of the national unemployment rate to establish programs to ensure that any individual within the area served by the entity that applies for a job through the program will be provided with employment as provided in this Act. Provides that the grant shall have a duration of 3 years and be used to provide jobs to persons who are 18 year of age or older. Establishes wage and benefit requirements. Creates the Job Guarantee Program Fund, a special fund in the State treasury, to hold moneys appropriated to the fund and interest earned. Imposes reporting and auditing requirements. Defines terms.
Title
STATE JOBS GUARANTEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3419&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3419.htm |