IL HB3414 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires substance abuse testing as a condition for filing nomination papers for the office of State Representative or State Senator. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall require a drug test to screen each individual who applies for Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF). Provides that the cost of drug testing shall be the responsibility of the individual tested and that an individual who tests positive for controlled substances shall be ineligible to receive TANF benefits for one year after the date of the positive drug test, unless the individual meets certain requirements. Contains provisions concerning notice; persons required to comply with the drug testing requirements; persons exempted from the drug testing requirements; circumstances under which an applicant who fails a drug test has the right to take one or more additional tests; and other matters. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
DRUG ABUSE-ELECTION-PUBLIC AID
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | To Ballot Access Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 7-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 4-1.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3414&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3414.htm |