IL HB3380 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Repeals the general recidivism provisions of the Code. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a movant may present a meritorious claim for relief from judgment if the allegations in the petition establish the following by a preponderance of the evidence that, prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act, the movant was sentenced to natural life imprisonment under the general recidivism provisions of the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that nothing in this provision prevents a movant from applying for any other relief under the relief from judgments provision or any other law otherwise available to him or her.
Title
CD CORR&CIVIL PRO-RECIDIVISM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-006-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-005-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-95 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 2-1401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |