IL HB3376 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Requires proof that each party to the marriage has attained the age of 18 years in order to obtain a license to marry and a marriage certificate from the county clerk. Deletes language allowing proof that each party to the marriage will have attained the age of 18 years at the time the marriage license is effective or will have attained the age of 16 years and has either the consent to the marriage of both parents or his guardian or judicial approval. Repeals a provision regarding judicial approval of underage marriages. Effective immediately.
Title
IMDMA-NO MARRIAGE UNDER AGE 18
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Chris Bos [R] | Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-09-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-09-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | To Family Law & Probate Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 208 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3376&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3376.htm |