IL HB3376 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Rehabilitation of Persons with Disabilities Act. Provides that a home care consumer in the Department of Human Services' Home Services Program has the right and discretion to: (i) select and hire a personal assistant or other individual provider of his or her choice; and (ii) determine the number of hours worked weekly by his or her personal assistant or other individual provider. Provides that, subject to the Department's authority to approve the total monthly hours in a home care consumer's service plan, the State of Illinois and any of its departments, including the Department, shall not limit the number of weekly hours worked by personal assistants or other individual providers in the Department's Home Services Program. Provides that the provisions do not limit the Department's authority in any other statute to disqualify an individual from providing services in the Department's Home Services Program for reasons other than the number of weekly hours worked by the individual.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-HOME CARE CONSUMER RIGHTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2017
2017-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-29SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-003-000
2017-05-26SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-05-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-049-000
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-22HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-004-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2024053Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback