IL HB3376 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that any person who earned in the year preceding his or her application for a new license or a renewal up to twice the annual United States national poverty level as published in the Federal Register by the United States Department of Health and Human Services shall submit $50 with the application for a new license and $25 for a renewal. Provides that all fees collected under this provision shall be deposited into the State Police Firearm Services Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
CONCEALED CARRY-LICENSE FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3376&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3376.htm |