IL HB3376 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Makes changes concerning annual increases to the monthly annuities of persons who first become a policeman on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act and deletes repetitive language concerning annual increases in survivor's annuities for new hires. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CHIC POLICE-INCREASES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0344 |
2011-08-12 | House | Effective Date August 12, 2011 |
2011-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2011 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions and Investments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2011 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2011-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 5-167.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |