IL HB3360 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that in all actions brought to recover damages for personal injuries or wrongful death resulting from or occasioned by the wrongful conduct of any other person or entity, the plaintiff shall recover prejudgment interest on all damages set forth in the judgment. Provides that a local public entity is not liable to pay prejudgment interest in an action brought directly or vicariously against it by the injured party. Provides that for any personal injury or wrongful death occurring before the effective date of the amendatory Act, the prejudgment interest shall begin to accrue on the later of the effective date of the amendatory Act or the date the alleged tortfeasor has notice of the injury. Provides that the trial court may apportion any amount of prejudgment interest between the plaintiff and any agency or department of the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FORECLOSURE-FILING FEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-12 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 69 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13HousePassed Both Houses
2021-01-13HouseHouse Concurs
2021-01-13HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 069-042-001
2021-01-12HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000
2021-01-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-01-11HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2021-01-11HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2021-01-11HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-01-11HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-01-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2021-01-11HouseArrived in House
2021-01-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-017-002
2021-01-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2021-01-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2021-01-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-01-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-01-11SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2021-01-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-01-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2021-01-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021
2021-01-10SenateSecond Reading
2021-01-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021
2021-01-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021
2021-01-10SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-08SenatePostponed - Financial Institutions
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - Financial Institutions
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-044-000
2019-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000
2019-03-27HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-03-27HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-002-000
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-03-06HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
735515-1504.1Amended CodeCitation Text
735515-1507.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3360&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3360.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3360eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3360enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3360ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3360ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3360sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3360_04042019_023000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB3360_01112021_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3360sam001_01122021_016000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback