IL HB3360 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Creates the "Achieving a Better Life Experience" or "ABLE" account plan to encourage and assist individuals and families in saving private funds for the purpose of supporting persons with disabilities in endeavors to maintain health, independence, and quality of life. and to provide secure funding for disability-related expenses on behalf of designated beneficiaries with disabilities that will supplement, but not supplant, benefits provided through private insurance, federal and State medical and disability insurance, the beneficiary's employment, and other sources. Provides that the State Treasurer shall be primarily responsible for the plan but shall work with the Illinois State Board of Investment. Sets forth the requirements of the plan. Requires the State Treasurer to adopt rules to implement the program. Defines required terms. Effective immediately.
Title
ABLE ACCOUNT PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3360&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3360.htm |